VA SB1324 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate: Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Crimes against incapacitated or elder adults; penalty. Provides that any person who commits an offense set forth in Chapter 4 (crimes against the person), Chapter 5 (crimes against property), or Chapter 6 (crimes involving fraud) of Title 18.2, knowing or having reason to know that the victim of the offense is an incapacitated or elder adult is guilty of a separate and distinct Class 1 misdemeanor if the underlying offense is a misdemeanor and a separate and distinct Class 6 felony if the underlying offense is a felony. The bill also provides that if the offender is a person responsible for the care of the victim, punishment shall include a mandatory minimum term of confinement of 30 days if the underlying offense is a misdemeanor and a mandatory minimum term of confinement of six months if the underlying offense is a felony.
Title
Incapacitated or elder adults; person who commits crimes against is guilty of misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate: Left in Finance | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Incorporates SB919 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104433D-S1 | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100520D |