VA SB1310 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal information of judges and magistrates; penalty. Prohibits the Commonwealth from publishing on the Internet the personal information of any active or retired federal or Virginia justice, judge, or magistrate who has made a demand in writing to the Commonwealth that the Commonwealth not publish such information; such demand shall be effective until rescinded by such judge, justice, or magistrate. The bill adds active or retired federal or Virginia justices, judges, and magistrates to the list of people for which an enhanced punishment applies for the crime of using such person's identity with the intent to coerce, intimidate, or harass. The bill also adds active and retired magistrates to the list of people who may furnish, in addition to his residence street address, a post office box address located within the Commonwealth to be included in lieu of his street address on the lists of registered voters. The bill removes state and federal judges and justices from the definition of "public official." As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Judicial Council of Virginia.
Title
Judges and magistrates, retired or active; personal information on the Internet, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) (Y: 74 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 4-N) (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0802) | |
2023-05-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 802 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Communicated to Governor |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's substitute printed 23107664D-S2 |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1310ER) |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Title replaced 23106698D-H1 |
2023-02-20 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | VOTE: Passage (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Passed House with substitute (74-Y 25-N) |
2023-02-16 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB1310H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106698D-H1 |
2023-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-13 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106698D-H1 |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 4-N) |
2023-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2023-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1310S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105772D-S1 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 1-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105772D-S1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101589D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2024 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
HB2024 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
HB2024 (Same As) 2023-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0801)
Subjects
Appropriations
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Elections
Internet
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Magistrates
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Elections
Internet
Judges Justices and Other Elective Officers
Magistrates
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 186.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 418 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |