VA SB1310 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1310
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Employment; domestic service; Human Rights Act. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and laws regarding the payment of wages. The measure also provides that the prohibitions on nondiscrimination in employment of the Virginia Human Rights Act apply to employers that employ one or more domestic workers. Employment; domestic service; Human Rights Act. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and laws regarding the payment of wages. The measure also provides that the prohibitions on nondiscrimination in employment of the Virginia Human Rights Act apply to employers that employ one or more domestic workers.
Title
Va. Human Rights Act; application of laws applicable to employee safety and payment of wages.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 21103755D-ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1310ES1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103755D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103755D-S1 |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102808D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1310 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
40 | 1 | 49.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
65 | 2 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |