VA SB1310 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB1310

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Employment; domestic service; Virginia Human Rights Act. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and laws regarding the payment of wages. The measure also provides that the prohibitions on nondiscrimination in employment of the Virginia Human Rights Act apply to employers that employ one or more domestic workers. Employment; domestic service; Virginia Human Rights Act. Provides that individuals who are engaged in providing domestic service are not excluded from employee protection laws and laws regarding the payment of wages. The measure also provides that the prohibitions on nondiscrimination in employment of the Virginia Human Rights Act apply to employers that employ one or more domestic workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Human Rights Act; application of laws applicable to employee safety and payment of wages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N) (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1310ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (13-Y 9-N)
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2021-02-07HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-02-07HouseRead first time
2021-02-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-05SenateRead third time and passed Senate (21-Y 18-N)
2021-02-04SenatePrinted as engrossed 21103755D-ES1
2021-02-04SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1310ES1
2021-02-04SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-04SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-04SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21103755D-S1
2021-02-04SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-04SenateRead second time
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (12-Y 4-N)
2021-01-25SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-01-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 21103755D-S1
2021-01-25SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 3-N)
2021-01-12SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-01-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102808D

Same As/Similar To

SB1310 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Labor and Commerce by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
223905(n/a)See Bill Text
4012(n/a)See Bill Text
40129(n/a)See Bill Text
40149.3(n/a)See Bill Text
40149.8(n/a)See Bill Text
652101(n/a)See Bill Text
652305(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1310
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1310+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1310S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1310ES1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1310ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0513+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+SB1310AS
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1310F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1310FS1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1310FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1310FES1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1310FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S02C0025+SB1310
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05C0104+SB1310
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0288SB1310+SB1310
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0347SB1310+SB1310
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H14V0017+SB1310
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1770+SB1310

Bill Comments

feedback