VA SB1303 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; deadline for registration by electronic means. Requires that voter registration applications made by electronic means be made by 5:00 p.m. on the final day for registration before an election and that the principal office of each general registrar close for voter registration purposes at 5:00 p.m. on the final day of registration; the same deadline applies to the receipt of certain mail voter registration applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; deadline for registration by electronic means.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N) (Y: 32 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05SenateCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N)
2017-04-05SenateReconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
2017-04-05SenateSenate rejected Governor's recommendation (18-Y 21-N)
2017-03-24SenateGovernor's recommendation received by Senate
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1303ER)
2017-03-07SenateEnrolled
2017-02-22SenateHouse amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (62-Y 35-N)
2017-02-21HousePassed House with amendment (62-Y 35-N)
2017-02-21HouseEngrossed by House as amended
2017-02-21HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2017-02-21HouseRead third time
2017-02-20HouseRead second time
2017-02-17HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 7-N)
2017-02-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 2-N)
2017-01-31HouseAssigned P & E sub: Elections
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-31HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-01-24SenateRead third time and passed Senate (32-Y 7-N)
2017-01-23SenateRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-20SenatePassed by for the day
2017-01-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 1-N)
2017-01-10SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2017-01-10SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103072D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242414(n/a)See Bill Text
242414.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+SB1303
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1303+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+SB1303ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S08V0027+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0070SB1303+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0099SB1303+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1804V0040+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H18V0108+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2554+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0836SB1303+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1112SB1303+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1114SB1303+SB1303
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1115SB1303+SB1303

Bill Comments

feedback