VA SB1265 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1265
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Natural gas pipelines; stop work instructions. Authorizes the Department of Environmental Quality to conduct inspections of the land-disturbing activities related to construction of any natural gas transmission pipeline equal to or greater than 24 inches inside diameter. Current law authorizes such inspections only if such inside diameter is greater than 36 inches. The bill also specifies certain instances that may give rise to such inspection and authorizes the Department to issue a stop work instruction for every work area in Virginia in the event that substantial adverse impacts or likely adverse impacts are found on a repeated, frequent, and widespread basis. Natural gas pipelines; stop work instructions. Authorizes the Department of Environmental Quality to conduct inspections of the land-disturbing activities related to construction of any natural gas transmission pipeline equal to or greater than 24 inches inside diameter. Current law authorizes such inspections only if such inside diameter is greater than 36 inches. The bill also specifies certain instances that may give rise to such inspection and authorizes the Department to issue a stop work instruction for every work area in Virginia in the event that substantial adverse impacts or likely adverse impacts are found on a repeated, frequent, and widespread basis.
Title
Natural gas pipelines; stop work orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) (Y: 61 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0277) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 277 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1265ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (61-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (61-Y 39-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (14-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1265S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103789D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103789D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101609D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1265 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:37.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:58.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |