VA SB125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Punitive damages for persons injured by intoxicated drivers. Provides that, for the purposes of a punitive damages award in a civil action for personal injury or death arising from the operation of a motor vehicle while intoxicated, in order to have a rebuttable presumption that a defendant's blood alcohol concentration at the time of the incident causing injury or death was at least as high as results of a blood or breath test, such test must have been administered in accordance with the provisions of §§ 18.2-268.1 through 18.2-268.12, which lay out the procedures for obtaining blood and breath tests. Under current law, to have the rebuttable presumption, such blood or breath test must have been administered within three hours of the incident causing injury or death.
Title
Punitive damages; persons injured by intoxicated drivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0510) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 510 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB125ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2016-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101257D |