VA SB1239 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Absentee voting; third-party absentee ballot assembly and distribution. Permits a general registrar to contract with a third party for the printing, assembly, and mailing of absentee ballots. The bill directs the State Board of Elections to adopt emergency regulations to implement the provisions of the bill and for those regulations to include processes to ensure secure and timely delivery of voter information to contractors and reports of mailed absentee ballots from contractors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee voting; third-party absentee ballot assembly and distribution.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 2-N 2-A) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-25SenateRead third time and passed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2021-01-22SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 2-N 2-A)
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100930D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242706(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback