VA SB1228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lien for water and sewer charges. Adds the Town of Clifton Forge to those localities that may provide that charges imposed for water or sewers shall be a lien on the real estate served by such waterline or sewer. Where residential rental real estate is involved, no lien shall attach (i) unless the user of the water or sewer services is also the owner of the real estate or (ii) unless the owner of the real estate negotiated or executed the agreement by which such water or sewer services were provided to the property.
Title
Water and sewer charges; charges imposed by Town of Clifton Forge shall be lien on real estate.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533) | |
2011-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1228ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-22 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed House (87-Y 10-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (35-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-18 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103916D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1772 (Same As) 2011-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0340)
Subjects
Clifton Forge, Town of
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Mechanics' and Certain Other Liens
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Water and Sewer Systems
Counties, Cities, and Towns
Mechanics' and Certain Other Liens
Real Estate and Real Estate Tax
Water and Sewer Systems