VA SB1220 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1220

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State facilities; admission of certain aliens. Repeals the requirements that (i) the Commissioner of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services determine the nationality of each person admitted to a state facility and, if the person is an alien, notify the United States immigration officer in charge of the district in which the state facility is located and (ii) upon request of the United States immigration officer in charge of the district in which a state facility to which a person who is an alien is admitted is located or the judge or special justice who certified or ordered the admission of such alien, the clerk of the court furnish a certified copy of records pertaining to the case of the admitted alien.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State facilities; admission of certain aliens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (10-Y 3-N) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 244 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1220ER)
2021-02-24SenateEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-19HousePassed House (55-Y 45-N)
2021-02-19HouseRead third time
2021-02-18HouseRead second time
2021-02-16HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (13-Y 8-N)
2021-02-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N)
2021-02-09HouseAssigned HWI sub: Behavioral Health
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-26SenateRead third time and passed Senate (25-Y 14-N)
2021-01-25SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-22SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Education and Health (10-Y 3-N)
2021-01-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-01-11SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-11SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101347D

Same As/Similar To

SB1220 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
372827(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+SB1220
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1220+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+SB1220ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0244+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1220F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+SB1220FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0042+SB1220
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0080SB1220+SB1220
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SC0123SB1220+SB1220
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1203V0003+SB1220
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12V0019+SB1220
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1766+SB1220

Bill Comments 750

feedback