VA SB1205 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Tangible personal property; commercial fishing vessels. Classifies commercial fishing vessels and property permanently attached to such vessels as a separate class of property for the purpose of local personal property tax.
Title
Commercial fishing vessels; classifies vessels as a separate class of property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0447) | |
2017-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 447 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1205ER) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2017-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-02-15 | House | Passed House (97-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2017-02-15 | House | Read third time |
2017-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported from Finance (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103826D |