VA SB12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nondiscrimination in public employment. Prohibits discrimination in public employment on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity, as defined in the bill. The bill also codifies for state and local government employment the current prohibitions on discrimination in employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a special disabled veteran or other veteran.
Title
Public employment; prohibited discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16100354D-E |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB12E |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (9-Y 4-N 1-A) |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100354D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |