VA SB1198 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Operators of emergency vehicles; Emergency Vehicle Operator's Course. Requires that ordinances relating to the powers and duties of fire departments and fire companies and regulations made by fire companies contain the requirement that a member of a fire department or fire company who operates an emergency vehicle possess a valid motor vehicle operator's permit and complete an approved Emergency Vehicle Operator's Course or equivalent training course recognized by the Department of Fire Programs or the Office of Emergency Medical Services. The bill requires such operators of emergency vehicles prior to July 1, 2017, to successfully complete such a course no later than July 1, 2020.
Title
Operators of emergency vehicles; completion of Emergency Vehicle Operator's Course.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (30-Y 9-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103587D |