VA SB1185 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting entry onto school or other property; penalty. Expands the prohibition on entry onto school grounds by any adult convicted of a sexually violent offense to include any school bus as defined in §46.2-100 and any property, public or private, during hours when such property is being used solely by a public or private elementary or secondary school for a school-related or school-sponsored activity. A violation is punishable as a Class 6 felony.
Title
Sex offenders; prohibiting entry onto school grounds during school-related activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 855 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB1185ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1185ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Committee substitute rejected 11105257D-H1 | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-22 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-18 | House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2011-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105257D-H1 | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (19-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-08 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 11101109D-E | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB1185E | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-03 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Rereferred to Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-13 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-12 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101109D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2066 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)