VA HB2066 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sex offenses prohibiting entry onto school or other property; penalty. Expands the prohibition on entry onto school grounds by any adult convicted of a sexually violent offense to include any school bus as defined in §46.2-100 and any property, public or private, during hours when such property is being used solely by a public or private elementary or secondary school for a school-related or school-sponsored activity. A violation is punishable as a Class 6 felony.
Title
Sex offenders; prohibiting entry onto school grounds or other property, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0796) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Enacted, Chapter 796 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB2066ER2) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Reenrolled | |
2011-04-06 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-04-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-26 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2066ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate substitute agreed to by House 11105342D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-21 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-18 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2011-02-17 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2066S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11105342D-S1 | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11105342D-S1 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2066H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104936D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-04 | House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety | |
2011-01-31 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104936D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-19 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101197D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1185 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0855)