VA SB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Expungement of certain offenses. Allows a person to petition for expungement of a deferred disposition dismissal for underage alcohol possession or using a false ID to obtain alcohol when the offense occurred prior to the person's twenty-first birthday, all court costs and fines and orders of restitution have been satisfied, and the person seeking the expungement is at least 21 years of age and has no other alcohol-related convictions. The bill provides that any person seeking expungement of an alcohol-related charge shall be assessed a $150 fee, which shall be paid into the state treasury and credited to the Department of State Police.
Title
Underage alcoholic possession, etc.; expungement of certain offenses.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Incorporated by Judiciary (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Incorporated by Judiciary |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104018D |
Same As/Similar To
SB608 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice