VA SB608 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Expungement of police and court records; pardons. Allows a person to petition for the expungement of the police and court records relating to such person's conviction for misdemeanors and certain felonies if he has been granted a simple pardon for the crime. The bill also allows a person to petition for an expungement of the police and court records relating to convictions of marijuana possession, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol, and for deferred disposition dismissals for possession of controlled substances or marijuana, underage alcohol or tobacco possession, and using a false ID to obtain alcohol, when all court costs, fines, and restitution have been paid, and five years have elapsed since the date of completion of all terms of sentencing and probation. Under current law, police and court records relating to convictions are only expunged if a person received an absolute pardon for a crime he did not commit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Police and court records; expungement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePrinted as engrossed 20106735D-ES1
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB608ES1
2020-02-11SenateAmendments by Senator Surovell agreed to
2020-02-11SenateReading of amendments waived
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20106735D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-01-29SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateCommittee substitute printed 20106735D-S1
2020-01-29SenateIncorporates SB517 (McDougle)
2020-01-29SenateIncorporates SB118 (Peake)
2020-01-29SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 0-N)
2020-01-20SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103840D

Same As/Similar To

SB118 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary
SB517 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB608&201+sum+SB608
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB608+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB608S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB608ES1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0109+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0277+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0608+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0520SB0608+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0521SB0608+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0522SB0608+SB0608
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0523SB0608+SB0608

Bill Comments

feedback