VA SB1164 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1164
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced recycling; definition. Defines, for purposes of the Virginia Waste Management Act, "advanced recycling" as a manufacturing process for the conversion of post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks into basic hydrocarbon raw materials and other materials. The bill also defines "gasification," "post-use polymer," and other terms related to advanced recycling. Advanced recycling; definition. Defines, for purposes of the Virginia Waste Management Act, "advanced recycling" as a manufacturing process for the conversion of post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks into basic hydrocarbon raw materials and other materials. The bill also defines "gasification," "post-use polymer," and other terms related to advanced recycling.
Title
Advanced recycling, etc.; definitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 5-N) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0375) | |
2021-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 375 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1164ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Passed House (90-Y 8-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 5-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1164S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103662D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103662D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101637D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1164 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote