VA SB1164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1164
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Advanced recycling; not considered solid waste management; definition. Defines "advanced recycling" as a manufacturing process for the conversion of post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks into basic hydrocarbon raw materials and other materials. The bill provides that advanced recycling shall not be considered solid waste management. The bill also defines "gasification," "post-use polymer," and other terms related to advanced recycling. Advanced recycling; not considered solid waste management; definition. Defines "advanced recycling" as a manufacturing process for the conversion of post-use polymers and recovered feedstocks into basic hydrocarbon raw materials and other materials. The bill provides that advanced recycling shall not be considered solid waste management. The bill also defines "gasification," "post-use polymer," and other terms related to advanced recycling.
Title
Advanced recycling; not considered solid waste management, definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2021-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-02-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1164S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103662D-S1 |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103662D-S1 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (12-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101637D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1164 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote