VA SB1147 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cemetery Board; resale of interment rights by churches or religious organizations; exemption. Establishes requirements for the resale of interment rights by churches or religious organizations. A resale conducted in compliance with the requirements set out by the bill shall be exempt from regulation by the Cemetery Board.
Title
Cemetery Board; resale of interment rights by churches or religious organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395) | |
2013-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/13) | |
2013-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1147ER) |
2013-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-02-20 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-19 | House | Engrossed by House as amended SB1147 |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2013-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2013-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-02-06 | House | Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2013-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103517D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Professions and Occupations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Professions and Occupations
Religious and Charitable Matters; Cemeteries
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2312.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2312.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |