VA SB1126 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1126
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; membership. Adds a member of the House of Delegates, to be appointed by the Speaker of the House, and a member of the Senate, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, to the Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads. Such legislative members must represent districts that include certain cities in the Hampton Roads region. The bill also requires that nonlegislative citizen members of the Commission appointed by the Governor have experience in one of the following fields: transit, transportation, or land use planning; management of transit, transportation, or other public sector operations; public budgeting or finance; corporate communications; government oversight; or state or local government. The new qualifications do not affect the appointment of any current members of the Commission until the expiration of their terms.
Title
Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; change in membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0435) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 435 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1126ER) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-16 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101294D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1126 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Hampton Roads Area
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Hampton Roads Area
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems