VA SB1126 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; membership. Adds a member of the House of Delegates, to be appointed by the Speaker of the House, and a member of the Senate, to be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, to the Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads. Such legislative members must represent districts that include certain cities in the Hampton Roads region. The bill also requires that nonlegislative citizen members of the Commission appointed by the Governor have experience in one of the following fields: transit, transportation, or land use planning; management of transit, transportation, or other public sector operations; public budgeting or finance; corporate communications; government oversight; or state or local government. The new qualifications do not affect the appointment of any current members of the Commission until the expiration of their terms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation District Commission of Hampton Roads; change in membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HouseContinued to Special Session 1 in Transportation by voice vote
2021-02-02HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-01-27SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26SenateRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22SenateReported from Rules (13-Y 0-N)
2020-12-23SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2020-12-23SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101294D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3321907(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback