VA SB1122 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance benefits for state employees. Provides that the health insurance coverage that may be purchased by state employees for families and dependents may include coverage for any other person to whom coverage may be extended pursuant to §38.2-3525 of the Code of Virginia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State employees; health insurance benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-02-22 House: Left in General Laws
2011-02-15 House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2011-02-14 House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process
2011-02-10 House: Referred to Committee on General Laws
2011-02-10 House: Read first time
2011-02-10 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-02 Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (23-Y 17-N)
2011-02-01 Senate: Read second time and engrossed
2011-01-31 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2011-01-27 Senate: Reported from Finance (9-Y 4-N)
2011-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance
2011-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101879D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222818(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback