VA SB1111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Board for People with Disabilities; membership; powers and duties. Modifies membership eligibility and the duties of the Virginia Board for People with Disabilities and changes the name of the State Planning Council to the State Council on Developmental Disabilities to align the Code of Virginia with the federal Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act of 2000.
Title
People with Disabilities, Virginia Board for; membership, powers and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1111ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101478D |