VA SB1109 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corrections; use of inmate labor. Authorizes the use of inmate labor at rest areas along the Interstate Highway System.
Title
Inmate labor; authorizes use thereof at rest areas along Interstate Highway System.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048) | |
2011-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 48 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-18 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1109ER) | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-15 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (68-Y 30-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Passed House (68-Y 30-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-14 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-11 | House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (18-Y 2-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (13-Y 1-N) | |
2011-01-24 | Senate: Assigned Rehab sub: Corrections | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101656D |