VA SB1106 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unclaimed cremains of veterans; eligible dependents; veterans service organizations. Authorizes a funeral director to notify a veterans service organization as an alternative to notifying the Department of Veterans Services (Department) when cremains remain unclaimed. The bill also requires the Department or a veterans service organization, in addition to determining if unclaimed cremains are those of a veteran as provided under current law, to determine if unclaimed cremains are those of a veteran's eligible dependent. The bill also authorizes a funeral director to transfer the cremains of an eligible veteran or his eligible dependent to a veterans service organization or the Department for the purpose of disposition of such cremains and provides that absent bad faith or malicious intent no funeral director or veterans service organization is liable for civil negligence for actions permitted under the law. The bill also changes from 30 days to 45 days the time in which the Department or veterans service organization is required to notify the funeral director if the cremains are those of a veteran or eligible dependent. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Veterans; unclaimed cremains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138) | |
2015-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1106ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100581D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2808.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2808.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |