VA SB1102 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1102
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; personal care aides; orientation program. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish an orientation program for all personal care aides who provide self-directed services through the Medicaid program. The bill lays out the topics to be covered by such orientations, requires orientations to be held in-person or online at least quarterly, and specifies that personal care aides shall be invited and encouraged to attend at least one such orientation per calendar year. Department of Medical Assistance Services; personal care aides; orientation program. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish an orientation program for all personal care aides who provide self-directed services through the Medicaid program. The bill lays out the topics to be covered by such orientations, requires orientations to be held in-person or online at least quarterly, and specifies that personal care aides shall be invited and encouraged to attend at least one such orientation per calendar year.
Title
Personal care aides; DMAS shall establish an orientation program for certain aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1102ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-15 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1102S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103253D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103253D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101111D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1102 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote