VA SB1102 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1102
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Medical Assistance Services; personal care aides; orientation program. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish an orientation program for all personal care aides who provide self-directed services through the Medicaid program. The bill lays out the topics to be covered by such orientations, requires orientations to be held in-person or online at least quarterly, and specifies that personal care aides shall be invited and encouraged to attend at least one such orientation per calendar year. Department of Medical Assistance Services; personal care aides; orientation program. Requires the Department of Medical Assistance Services to establish an orientation program for all personal care aides who provide self-directed services through the Medicaid program. The bill lays out the topics to be covered by such orientations, requires orientations to be held in-person or online at least quarterly, and specifies that personal care aides shall be invited and encouraged to attend at least one such orientation per calendar year.
Title
Personal care aides; DMAS shall establish an orientation program for certain aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1102S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21103253D-S1 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21103253D-S1 |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101111D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1102 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Health, Welfare and Institutions by voice vote