VA SB1099 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority. Creates the Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority to facilitate, coordinate, and support the development of the solar energy industry and solar-powered electric energy facilities in the Commonwealth. The Authority is directed to do so by developing programs to increase the availability of financing for solar energy projects, facilitate the increase of solar energy generation systems on public and private sector facilities in the Commonwealth, promote the growth of the Virginia solar industry, and provide a hub for collaboration between entities to partner on solar energy projects. The Authority will be composed of 11 members, of whom six will be appointed by the Governor, three will be appointed by the Speaker of the House, and two will be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. Members may be representatives of solar businesses, solar customers, renewable energy financiers, state and local government solar customers, and solar research academics. The Authority is charged with, among other tasks, (i) identifying existing state and regulatory or administrative barriers to the development of the solar energy industry; (ii) collaborating with entities such as higher education institutions to increase the training and development of the workforce needed by the solar industry in Virginia, including industry-recognized credentials and certifications; (iii) applying to the U.S. Department of Energy for loan guarantees for such projects; and (iv) performing any other activities as may seem appropriate to increase solar energy generation in Virginia and the associated jobs and economic development and competitiveness benefits. The Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy may utilize non-state-funded support to carry out any duties assigned to the Director. Funding may be provided by any source, public or private, for the purposes for which the Authority is created. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2025.
Title
Virginia Solar Energy Development Authority; created, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 17-N 1-A) (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0090) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 90 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1099ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (79-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House with amendment (79-Y 17-N 1-A) |
2015-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (18-Y 3-N) |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1099S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15104008D-S1 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15104008D-S1 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103208D |