VA SB1098 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1098
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Aircraft registration; unmanned aircraft. Exempts an owner of an unmanned aircraft from the requirement to register aircrafts.
Title
Unmanned aircraft; exempts an owner from the requirement to register.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-11-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100624D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1098 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Communications, Technology and Innovation by voice vote