VA SB1082 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-21 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
School principals; incident reports. Eliminates the requirement that school principals report certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense to law enforcement.
Title
School principals; incident reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | Left in Education |
2017-02-15 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1082S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 17105163D-S1 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Incorporates SB1163 (Reeves) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 17105163D-S1 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102792D |