VA SB107 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transient occupancy tax; Arlington County. Removes the July 1, 2021, sunset date from Arlington County's authority to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed 0.25 percent to be used for the purpose of promoting tourism and business travel in the county. Under current law, in addition to this tax, Arlington County is authorized to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed five percent.
Title
Transient occupancy tax; removes 7/1/21, sunset date from Arlington County's authority to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0061) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 61 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB107ER) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | House | VOTE: Passage (78-Y 22-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House (78-Y 22-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (31-Y 9-N) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Finance to Finance and Appropriations due to a change of the committee name |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101359D |
Same As/Similar To
HB62 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0238)