VA HB62 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Transient occupancy tax; Arlington County. Removes the July 1, 2021, sunset date from Arlington County's authority to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed 0.25 percent to be used for the purpose of promoting tourism and business travel in the county. Under current law, in addition to this tax, Arlington County is authorized to impose a transient occupancy tax at a rate not to exceed five percent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transient occupancy tax; removes July 1, 2021, sunset date from Arlington County, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Finance (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Finance (15-Y 7-N)
2020-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100760D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813825.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback