VA SB1068 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Members of boards of visitors; employment waiting period. Prohibits a baccalaureate public institution of higher education from employing an individual appointed by the Governor to the board of visitors of such institution within two years of the expiration of such member's term but exempts the employment of the institution president or superintendent from such prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Members of boards of visitors; employment waiting period.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 3-N) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0373)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 373 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB1068ER)
2019-02-20SenateEnrolled
2019-02-15HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 3-N)
2019-02-15HousePassed House (90-Y 3-N)
2019-02-15HouseRead third time
2019-02-14HouseRead second time
2019-02-13HouseReported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
2019-02-11HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-02-04HouseRead first time
2019-02-04HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-01-29SenateRead third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenatePrinted as engrossed 19100453D-E
2019-01-28SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended SB1068E
2019-01-28SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-01-28SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-01-28SenateRead second time
2019-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N)
2019-01-24SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2018-12-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-12-12SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100453D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2311300(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+SB1068
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1068+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1068E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+SB1068ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0373+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0114+SB1068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0196SB1068+SB1068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0221SB1068+SB1068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0903V0027+SB1068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0143+SB1068
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2865+SB1068

Bill Comments

feedback