VA SB1047 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-22 - House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provisional driver's license holders. Makes cell phone use while driving by a provisional driver's license holder a primary offense.
Title
Driver's license holders, provisional; makes cell phone use while driving a primary offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | House: Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-17 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2011-02-15 | House: Assigned MPPS sub: #2 | |
2011-02-09 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2011-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 2-N) | |
2011-01-21 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Rereferred to Courts of Justice | |
2011-01-20 | Senate: Rereferred from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101452D |