VA SB1043 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public education; student mental health and counseling; definitions; licensure requirements. Requires the Department of Education, in consultation with the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Department of Medical Assistance Services, to develop, adopt, and distribute to each school board a model memorandum of understanding between a school board and a public or private community mental health services provider that sets forth parameters for the provision of mental health services to public school students enrolled in the local school division by such provider. The bill requires the memorandum of understanding to be available to each school board no later than the beginning of the 2023–2024 school year. The bill also permits, in order to fill vacant school psychologist positions, any local school board to employ, under a provisional license issued by the Department of Education for three school years with an allowance for an additional two-year extension, clinical psychologists licensed by the Board of Psychology, provided that any such individual makes progress toward completing the requirements for full licensure as a school psychologist during such period of employment. Finally, the bill defines the terms "direct counseling" and "program planning and school support" for the purpose of the provision of law that requires each school counselor to spend at least 80 percent of his staff time during normal school hours in the direct counseling of individual students or groups of students.
Title
Public education; student mental health and counseling, definitions, licensure requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) (Y: 0 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349) | |
2023-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 349 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-13 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1043ER) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2023-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-24 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2023-02-23 | House | Delegates: Davis, Durant, VanValkenburg |
2023-02-23 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senators: McPike, Locke, Pillion |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-23 | House | House requested conference committee |
2023-02-23 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2023-02-23 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (0-Y 40-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed House with amendments (98-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment by Delegate Rasoul agreed to |
2023-02-22 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2023-02-22 | House | Read third time |
2023-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-17 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-15 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 2-N) |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2023-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-10 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 23105161D-ES1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB1043ES1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Amendment by Senator McPike agreed to |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 23105161D-S1 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 23105161D-S1 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Incorporates SB1268 (Favola) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Incorporates SB1257 (Favola) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2023-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103865D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1257 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB1268 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB1268 (Similar To) 2023-01-26 - Incorporated by Education and Health
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 253.13:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 272.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 291.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |