VA SB1025 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Coal surface mining operations; national pollutant discharge elimination system permits. Clarifies that the authority to issue pollutant discharge elimination system permits for coal surface mining operations has been delegated by the State Water Control Board to the Director of the Department of Mines, Minerals and Energy. The Director, by examining the available and relevant data, shall determine whether a discharge may cause or contribute to an instream excursion above the narrative or numeric criteria of a water quality standard. If a total maximum daily load ("TMDL") has been established for the receiving water body, it shall be considered in the reasonable potential determination. If the receiving water body does not have a TMDL established, the Director may consider biological monitoring, chemical monitoring, and whole effluent toxicity testing. The Director may require whole effluent toxicity testing if he determines that the discharge adversely affects the biological condition of the receiving water body.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coal surface mining operations; authority to issue pollutant discharge elimination permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N) (Y: 78 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
2011-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/11)
2011-02-25 Senate: Signed by President
2011-02-25 House: Signed by Speaker
2011-02-25 Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1025ER)
2011-02-25 Senate: Enrolled
2011-02-21 House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 23-N)
2011-02-21 House: Passed House (76-Y 23-N)
2011-02-21 House: Read third time
2011-02-18 House: Passed by for the day
2011-02-17 House: Read second time
2011-02-16 House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2011-02-09 House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2011-02-09 House: Read first time
2011-02-09 House: Placed on Calendar
2011-02-08 Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2011-02-08 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2011-02-08 Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1025S1
2011-02-08 Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104571D-S1
2011-02-08 Senate: Reading of substitute waived
2011-02-08 Senate: Read second time
2011-02-08 Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2011-02-07 Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104571D-S1
2011-02-07 Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (10-Y 5-N)
2011-01-11 Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2011-01-11 Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102807D

Same As/Similar To

HB2123 (Same As) 2011-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0252)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
451254(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+SB1025
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1025+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1025S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+SB1025ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+CHAP0290+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+S01V0068+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0334SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0347SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+SV0348SB1025+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+H01V0142+SB1025
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+vot+HV1144+SB1025

Bill Comments

feedback