VA HR123 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House (HR123ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Bill text as passed House (HR123ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Thomas Dale High School girls' indoor track and field team.
Title
Commending the Thomas Dale High School girls' indoor track and field team.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Bill text as passed House (HR123ER) |
2022-03-10 | House | Agreed to by House by voice vote |
2022-03-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed by until Thursday, March 10, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 22107426D |