VA HJR936 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ936ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-25 - House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ936ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the Alexandria Domestic Violence Program.
Title
Commending the Alexandria Domestic Violence Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-25 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ936ER) | |
2011-02-25 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate by voice vote | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Received | |
2011-02-22 | House: Introduced bill reprinted 11105199D | |
2011-02-22 | House: Agreed to by House by voice vote | |
2011-02-22 | House: Engrossed by House | |
2011-02-18 | House: Presented and laid on Speaker's table 11105199D |