VA HJR867 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ867ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Passed on February 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ867ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Charles J. Colgan.
Title
Celebrating the life of the Honorable Charles J. Colgan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ867ER) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Received |
2017-02-10 | House | Agreed to by House |
2017-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House |
2017-02-02 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 17104848D |