VA HJR662 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ662ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ662ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JCHC; dispensing of drugs and devices pursuant to prescriptions, pharmacy collaborative practice agreements, standing orders and statewide protocols; report. Directs the Joint Commission on Health Care to study the dispensing of drugs and devices pursuant to prescriptions, pharmacy collaborative practice agreements, standing orders, and statewide protocols in the Commonwealth, including a review of the roles and responsibilities of pharmacists and other health care providers prescribing, dispensing, and administering drugs and devices in accordance with laws and regulations.
Title
JCHC; dispensing of drugs and devices pursuant to pharmacy collaborative practice agreements, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ662ER) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate with amendment by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ662H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104412D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104412D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104139D |