VA HJR646 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ646ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ646ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
First Responders Day. Designates September 11, in 2019 and in each succeeding year, as First Responders Day in Virginia.
Title
First Responders Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ646ER) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reading waived (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reading waived |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House |
2019-02-04 | House | Taken up |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102130D |