VA HJR620 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; JLARC to study transportation funding in the Commonwealth; report. Directs the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to study the efficiency and sufficiency of funding for transportation programs in the Commonwealth.
Title
Transportation programs; JLARC to study efficiency and sufficiency of funding in State.
Sponsors
Del. Chris Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Rules |
2013-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-16 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2013-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102206D |
Subjects
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission (JLARC)
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Transportation
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HJ620 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HJ620+hil |