VA HJR581 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Agreed to by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the life of Karl David Stoltzfus, Sr.
Title
Celebrating the life of Karl David Stoltzfus, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Received |
2021-01-18 | House | Agreed to by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House |
2021-01-13 | House | Presented and laid on Speaker's table 21102267D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HJ581 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HJ581+hil |