VA HJR556 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Study; family life education; report. Establishes a joint subcommittee to study the fiscal impact of changing family life education from an opt-out program to an opt-in program. In conducting its study, the joint subcommittee shall (i) determine the cost of family life education to each public school division in the Commonwealth, (ii) estimate how many students would choose to participate in family life education should the program be changed to opt-in, and (iii) determine how much money the Commonwealth and each school division would save by changing family life education to an opt-in program.
Title
Family life education; subcommittee to study fiscal impact of changing from an opt-out program, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Rules | |
2011-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends no action by voice vote | |
2011-01-18 | House: Assigned Rules sub: #3 Studies | |
2011-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2011-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102401D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HJ556 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HJ556+hil |