VA HJR542 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Study; burial sites of enslaved persons; report. Requests the Department of Historic Resources to study the issues related to the identification, preservation, and maintenance of sites where enslaved persons are buried.
Title
Burial sites of enslaved persons; Department of Historic Resources to study related issues.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Rules |
2015-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-27 | House | Assigned Rules sub: Studies |
2014-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102753D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HJ542 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HJ542+hil |