VA HJR536 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ536ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-1)
Status: Passed on January 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-26 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ536ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Celebrating the lives of Randall Blevins, Fernando Chavez-Barron, Lorenzo Gamble, Tyneka Johnson, Brian Pendleton, and Kellie Pyle.
Title
Celebrating the lives of Randall Blevins, Fernando Chavez-Barron, Lorenzo Gamble, etc.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ536ER) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Laid on Clerk's Desk |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Received |
2023-01-16 | House | Agreed to by House |
2023-01-16 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and laid on Speaker's table; offered 01/11/23 23104190D |