VA HJR525 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HJR525
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns. Authorizes, and directs the submission to the Joint Committee of Congress on the Library, that the vacant spot of the Commonwealth in the National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol be filled with a statue to commemorate Barbara Rose Johns. The request is subject to written approval by the Governor and is made in accordance with the recommendation by the Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol.
Title
National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HJ525ER) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Reading waived |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HJ525H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103446D-H1 |
2021-01-26 | House | Taken up |
2021-01-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103446D-H1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101891D |
Same As/Similar To
HJR525 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
SJ288 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)
SJ288 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)
SJ288 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)
SJ288 (Same As) 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)