VA HJR525 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns. Authorizes, and directs the submission to the Joint Committee of Congress on the Library, that the vacant spot of the Commonwealth in the National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol be filled with a statue to commemorate Barbara Rose Johns. The request is subject to written approval by the Governor and is made in accordance with the recommendation by the Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol. National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns. Authorizes, and directs the submission to the Joint Committee of Congress on the Library, that the vacant spot of the Commonwealth in the National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol be filled with a statue to commemorate Barbara Rose Johns. The request is subject to written approval by the Governor and is made in accordance with the recommendation by the Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-27SenateReading waived
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Agree To (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAgreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HJ525H1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103446D-H1
2021-01-26HouseTaken up
2021-01-26HousePassed by temporarily
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103446D-H1
2021-01-22HouseReported from Rules with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2021-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Rules
2021-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101891D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback