VA SJR288 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR288
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns. Authorizes, and directs the submission to the Joint Committee of Congress on the Library, that the vacant spot of the Commonwealth in the National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol be filled with a statue to commemorate Barbara Rose Johns. The request is subject to written approval by the Governor and is made in accordance with the recommendation by the Commission for Historical Statues in the United States Capitol.
Title
National Statuary Hall Collection at the United States Capitol; Barbara Rose Johns.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] | Sen. Mamie Locke [D] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ288ER) |
2021-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (95-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Agreed to by House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-24 | House | Taken up |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (17-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-08 | House | Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote |
2021-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and agreed to by Senate by voice vote |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute SJ288S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Lucas agreed to 21104081D-S1 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 21104081D-S1 (Lucas) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reading waived (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101883D |
Same As/Similar To
SJR288 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Continued to Special Session 1 in Rules by voice vote
HJ525 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
HJ525 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
HJ525 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote
HJ525 (Same As) 2021-02-23 - Agreed to by Senate by voice vote